EP3945381 - PRODUCTION OF SURFACES DETERMINABLE BY MEANS OF CONE SEGMENTS USING A MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2022/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bretschneider, Jochen 88696 Owingen / DE | 02 /
Immenroth, Lars 08060 Zwickau / DE | 03 /
Vieweg, André 09112 Chemnitz / DE | [2022/05] | Application number, filing date | 20188968.0 | 31.07.2020 | [2022/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3945381 | Date: | 02.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/408 | [2022/05] | CPC: |
G05B19/4083 (EP);
G05B19/182 (US);
G05B19/40938 (US);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG DURCH KEGELSEGMENTE BESTIMMBARER FLÄCHEN MITTELS EINER WERKZEUGMASCHINE | [2022/05] | English: | PRODUCTION OF SURFACES DETERMINABLE BY MEANS OF CONE SEGMENTS USING A MACHINE TOOL | [2022/05] | French: | FABRICATION DE SURFACES DÉTERMINABLES À L'AIDE DES SEGMENTS CONIQUES AU MOYEN D'UNE MACHINE-OUTIL | [2022/05] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/02] | 29.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2216698 (DECKEL MAHO PFRONTEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0030] *; | [Y]EP3151073 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-16* abstract *; | [XI]DE102019100474 (SIG SAUER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,5,8,11,14-16 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0092] * * abstract * [I] 2-4,6,7,9,10,12,13 |