EP3779126 - EXTERNAL TURNING VANE FOR IFS-MOUNTED SECONDARY FLOW SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/07] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZSURKA, Mark 205 Waccabuc Road, Unit 18 Goldens Bridge, NY New York 10526 / US | 02 /
CARLSON, Laurel F. 179 S. Riverside Avenue Terryville, CT Connecticut 06786 / US | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 20189320.3 | 04.08.2020 | [2021/07] | Priority number, date | US201916534150 | 07.08.2019 Original published format: US201916534150 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3779126 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F01D17/10, F02C6/08, F02C7/18, F02K3/04, F02K3/075, F02K3/115 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
F01D17/105 (EP);
F02C9/18 (US);
B64D33/02 (US);
F02C6/08 (EP);
F02C7/04 (US);
F02C7/045 (US);
F02C7/055 (US);
F02C7/18 (EP);
F02K3/04 (EP);
F02K3/075 (EP);
F02K3/115 (EP);
F05D2220/32 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] |
Former [2021/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXTERNE WIRBELGENERIERENDE SCHAUFEL FÜR IFS-MONTIERTE SEKUNDÄRE DURCHFLUSSSYSTEME | [2021/07] | English: | EXTERNAL TURNING VANE FOR IFS-MOUNTED SECONDARY FLOW SYSTEMS | [2021/07] | French: | AUBE DIRECTRICE EXTERNE POUR SYSTÈMES D'ÉCOULEMENT SECONDAIRE MONTÉS SUR IFS | [2021/07] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 17.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3744745 (KERKER R, et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,5 *; | [X]US3934846 (MAURER OTTO F) [X] 1-8 * column 6, lines 3-25; figures 5a, 5c *; | [Y]US4836473 (AULEHLA FELIX [DE], et al) [Y] 9,10 * column 4, lines 21-27; figures 5,6 *; | [A]US6050527 (HEBERT LEONARD J [US], et al) [A] 1-10* column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 32; figures 6,8 *; | [A]US2009094989 (KRAFT ROBERT EUGENE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0031] , [0032]; figures 5,6 *; | [X]US2017328280 (HUSSAIN ZAHID M [GB], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0050]; figure 9 *; | [X]US2018058473 (KENWORTHY MICHAEL THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0038] - [0041]; figure 5 *; | [XY]US10233869 (RICE EDWARD C [US]) [X] 1-8 * column 6, lines 9-11; figure 8B * [Y] 9,10 |