EP3754554 - MODULE TAPE AND TRANSPONDER CHIP MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FÉINICS AMATECH TEORANTA Paragon Suite, IMI Sandyford Road Dublin 16, D16 X8C3 / IE | [2022/47] |
Former [2020/52] | For all designated states FÉINICS AMATECH TEORANTA Lower Churchfield County Mayo Tourmakeady / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lotya, Mustafa Beatty Grove, Celbridge Co Kildare / IE | 02 /
Finn, David Lower Churchfield Tourmakeady County Mayo / IE | 03 /
Molloy, Darren Wells Cottage Boula Hedford, County Galway / IE | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Cremer & Cremer Patentanwälte St.-Barbara-Straße 16 89077 Ulm / DE | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 20189581.0 | 27.11.2014 | [2020/52] | Priority number, date | US201414225570 | 26.03.2014 Original published format: US201414225570 | US201414281876 | 19.05.2014 Original published format: US201414281876 | US201462039562P | 20.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462039562 P | US201414465815 | 21.08.2014 Original published format: US201414465815 | US201462044394P | 01.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462044394 P | US201462048373P | 10.09.2014 Original published format: US 201462048373 P | US201414492113 | 22.09.2014 Original published format: US201414492113 | US201462061689P | 08.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462061689 P | US201414523993 | 27.10.2014 Original published format: US201414523993 | US201462069544P | 28.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462069544 P | US201462080332P | 16.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462080332 P | US201414551376 | 24.11.2014 Original published format: US201414551376 | [2020/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3754554 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
G06K19/07788 (EP);
G06K19/07747 (EP);
G06K19/07749 (EP);
G06K19/07767 (EP);
G06K19/07769 (EP);
G06K19/07775 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] |
Former [2020/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MODULBAND UND TRANSPONDERCHIPMODUL | [2020/52] | English: | MODULE TAPE AND TRANSPONDER CHIP MODULE | [2020/52] | French: | BANDE DE MODULE ET MODULE DE PUCE DE TRANSPONDEUR | [2020/52] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 23.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14806224.3 / EP3123400 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012018522 (LE GARREC LOIC [FR], et al) [X] 1,9,14 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0099]; figures 11-15 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * [I] 2-8,10-13,15; | [A]US2013140370 (FINN DAVID [IE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2013110625 (FEINICS AMATECH TEORANTA [IE]) [A] 1-15 * page 13 - page 27; figures 1-4a * |