EP3920355 - IMPROVED ELECTRIC CIRCUIT STRUCTURE FOR SHORT CIRCUIT PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leader Electronics Inc. 8F., No. 138, Ln. 235, Baoqiao Rd. Xindian Dist., New Taipei City 231 / TW | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENG, SHI-GUO New Taipei City 231 / TW | 02 /
ZHOU, ZUO-QUAN New Taipei City 231 / TW | 03 /
FENG, JING New Taipei City 231 / TW | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | Lang, Christian LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Ingolstädter Straße 5 80807 München / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20189942.4 | 06.08.2020 | [2021/49] | Priority number, date | TW20200207068U | 05.06.2020 Original published format: TW 109207068 U | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3920355 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02H7/125, H02H9/00, H02H9/04, H02M7/219, H02H3/20 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
H02H9/001 (EP);
H02H5/041 (US);
H01C7/04 (US);
H01C7/108 (US);
H01H85/044 (US);
H01H85/17 (US);
H02H3/087 (US);
H02H5/042 (US);
H02H7/1257 (EP);
H02H9/042 (EP);
H02H9/044 (US);
H02M7/062 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/16] |
Former [2021/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE ELEKTRISCHE SCHALTUNGSSTRUKTUR FÜR KURZSCHLUSSSCHUTZ | [2021/49] | English: | IMPROVED ELECTRIC CIRCUIT STRUCTURE FOR SHORT CIRCUIT PROTECTION | [2021/49] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CIRCUIT ÉLECTRIQUE AMÉLIORÉE POUR LA PROTECTION CONTRE LES COURTS-CIRCUITS | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/16] | 15.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JP2005073403 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,7 * the whole document * [A] 8-11 [I] 2-6; | [Y]CN201450446U (GUANGZHOU MEAN WELL ELECTRONIC PRODUCTS CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2012212986 (MINAMI EIJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract ** paragraphs [0041] , [0067] , [0079] - [0080] * |