EP3954213 - USE OF CURABLE COMPOSITIONS BASED ON POLYSILOXANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2022/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROLAND, Katrin 45257 Essen / DE | 02 /
FOTH, Julia 47495 Rheinberg / DE | 03 /
GENILKE, Laura 45147 Essen / DE | 04 /
SCHULTE, Simone 45133 Essen / DE | 05 /
JANKE, Christina 45327 Essen / DE | [2022/07] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2022/07] | Application number, filing date | 20190191.5 | 10.08.2020 | [2022/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3954213 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01N55/10, A01P1/00 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
A01N55/00 (EP);
C09D183/04 (CN,US);
C09D171/02 (US);
B05D1/02 (US);
C08G65/2642 (US);
C08G65/336 (US);
C08G77/18 (EP,US);
C09D5/08 (CN);
C09D5/14 (CN);
C09D5/16 (CN);
C09D5/1675 (US);
C09D7/63 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C09D183/04, C08L71/02, C08K5/57, C08K5/5435 (EP);
C09D183/04, C08L71/02, C08K5/57, C08K5/544 (EP);
C09D183/04, C08L75/08, C08L83/06, C08L63/00, C08K5/544 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON HÄRTBAREN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF BASIS VON POLYSILOXANEN | [2022/07] | English: | USE OF CURABLE COMPOSITIONS BASED ON POLYSILOXANES | [2022/07] | French: | UTILISATION DES COMPOSITIONS DURCISSABLES À BASE DE POLYSILOXANES | [2022/07] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/04] | 07.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006121937 (NDSU RES FOUNDATION [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0040] - [0041] * * claim 1 *; | [AD]EP3461864 (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-20 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] * * Tabelle 5: Zusammensetzung Z8 * * claims 1, 8, 19 *; | [A]EP3470475 (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0017] - [0018] - [ 0122] - [0129] * * claims 1, 10, 11 *; | [A] - P. RUSIN ET AL, "Rapid reduction of Legionella pneumophila on stainless steel with zeolite coatings containing silver and zinc ions", LETTERS IN APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, GB, (20030201), vol. 36, no. 2, doi:10.1046/j.1472-765X.2003.01265.x, ISSN 0266-8254, pages 69 - 72, XP055768523 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 71, column 1, line 18 - line 40 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1472-765X.2003.01265.x | by applicant | EP3461864 |