EP3779417 - SAMPLE HOLDING DEVICE FOR X-RAY ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rigaku Corporation 3-9-12, Matsubara-cho Akishima-shi Tokyo 196-8666 / JP | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Koichiro c/o Rigaku Corporation 3-9-12, Matsubara-cho Akishima-shi, Tokyo, 196-8666 / JP | [2024/03] |
Former [2021/07] | 01 /
ITO, Koichiro c/o Rigaku Corporation, 3-9-12, Matsubara-cho Akishima-shi Tokyo, 196-8666 / JP | Representative(s) | Lambacher, Michael, et al V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 3 81541 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 20190798.7 | 13.08.2020 | [2021/07] | Priority number, date | JP20190149383 | 16.08.2019 Original published format: JP 2019149383 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3779417 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3779417 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3779417 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/20025 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
G01N23/20025 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01N23/2204 (CN,KR,US);
G01T7/02 (KR);
G21F7/02 (KR);
G01N2223/056 (US);
G01N2223/1016 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] |
Former [2021/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PROBENHALTEVORRICHTUNG ZUR RÖNTGENANALYSE | [2021/07] | English: | SAMPLE HOLDING DEVICE FOR X-RAY ANALYSIS | [2021/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT D'ÉCHANTILLON POUR ANALYSE AUX RAYONS X | [2021/07] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 05.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3409769 (MCKINNEY CHARLES N, et al) [A] 1-7* column 7, line 26 - line 60; figures 5,6 *; | [A]US3478207 (GOERKE ROLF, et al) [A] 1-7 * column 4, line 30 - line 32; figures 6-8 *; | [XYI]US3973120 (KESSELS HENRICUS MATHIAS MARIE) [X] 1,3,7 * column 2, line 4 - line 35 * * column 3, line 32 - line 37 * [Y] 2 [I] 6; | [A]US5181233 (RINK WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 66; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]WO9915886 (UNIV BIRMINGHAM [GB], et al) [Y] 2 * page 7, line 3 - line 17; figure 2 *; | [X]US2003095634 (DOSHO AKIHIDE [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050]; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2006021961 (QUANTOMIX LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 12, line 4 - line 12 *; | [X] - RITTER J J, "AN HERMETICALLY SEALED INERT ATMOSPHERE CELL FOR X-RAY POWDER DIFFRACTION", POWDER DIFFRACTION, JCPDS-INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR DIFFRACTION DATA, WSARTHMORE, US, (19880301), vol. 3, no. 1, ISSN 0885-7156, page 30/31, XP009040615 [X] 1 * page 30, column rhc; figure 1 * | [A] - RODRIGUEZ MARK A. ET AL, "A beryllium dome specimen holder for XRD analysis of air sensitive materials", POWDER DIFFRACTION, US, (20080601), vol. 23, no. 2, doi:10.1154/1.2912452, ISSN 0885-7156, pages 121 - 124, XP055776503 [A] 1-7 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1154/1.2912452 | by applicant | JPH116805 |