EP3767781 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CHARGING, TRANSPORTING, AND OPERATING FLYING MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verity AG Binzmühlestrasse 81 8050 Zurich / CH | [2023/39] |
Former [2021/03] | For all designated states Verity AG Zürcherstrasse 39 8952 Schlieren / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUGUGLIARO, Federico Glattstegweg 74 8051 Zürich / CH | 02 /
D'ANDREA, Raffaello Schwyzerstrasse 50 8832 Wollerau / CH | 03 /
HEHN, Markus Saumackerstrasse 26 8048 Zürich / CH | 04 /
MUELLER, Mark W. 116 Duncan Street San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | 05 /
REIST, Philipp Im Birkenhof 3 8057 Zürich / CH | 06 /
WAIBEL, Markus Ruetihofstrasse 34 8049 Zürich / CH | [2021/09] |
Former [2021/03] | 01 /
AUGUGLIARO, Federico Glattstegweg 74 8051 Zürich / CH | ||
02 /
D'ANDREA, Raffaello Erlenstrasse 40B 8832 Wollerau / CH | |||
03 /
HEHN, Markus Saumackerstrasse 26 8048 Zürich / CH | |||
04 /
MUELLER, Mark W. 116 Duncan Street San Francisco, CA 94110 / US | |||
05 /
REIST, Philipp Im Birkenhof 3 8057 Zürich / CH | |||
06 /
WAIBEL, Markus Ruetihofstrasse 34 8049 Zürich / CH | Representative(s) | Haley Guiliano International LLP 26-28 Bedford Row London WC1R 4HE / GB | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 20191000.7 | 28.02.2017 | [2021/03] | Priority number, date | US201662301524P | 29.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662301524 P | US201762460703P | 17.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762460703 P | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3767781 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, B64C39/02, G05D1/10 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
H02J7/0042 (EP);
B60L53/16 (KR);
B64C39/024 (US);
B60L53/305 (KR);
B60L53/53 (KR);
B64F1/16 (US);
B64U30/20 (EP,KR,US);
B64U50/19 (EP,KR,US);
B64U50/37 (EP,KR,US);
B64U80/25 (EP,KR,US);
B64U80/70 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2200/10 (KR);
B64U10/14 (EP,KR,US);
B64U2201/20 (KR);
B64U70/00 (US);
G08G5/0013 (US);
G08G5/0069 (US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,KR);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T50/50 (KR);
Y02T50/60 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] |
Former [2021/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM LADEN, TRANSPORTIEREN UND BETREIBEN VON FLUGMASCHINEN | [2021/03] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CHARGING, TRANSPORTING, AND OPERATING FLYING MACHINES | [2021/03] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CHARGE, DE TRANSPORT ET DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE MACHINES VOLANTES | [2021/03] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 19.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17711763.7 / EP3424126 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03059735 (ARLTON PAUL E [US], et al); | [A]US2014249693 (STARK JAMES ALEXANDER [US], et al); | [IA]WO2015195175 (BORKO BRANDON [US]) |