EP3957439 - MANUFACTURING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gerresheimer Regensburg GmbH Kumpfmühler Str. 2 93047 Regensburg / DE | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reger, Florian 92536 Pfreimd / DE | 02 /
Scheck, Guenther 92447 Zangenstein / DE | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 20191379.5 | 17.08.2020 | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3957439 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B25B5/04, B25B5/06, B25B5/14, B25B11/00 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
B25B5/04 (EP);
A61M5/3129 (CN);
B05B13/0436 (US);
B05B13/0235 (US);
B05B13/0627 (US);
B05D1/36 (US);
B05D7/227 (US);
B25B1/04 (US);
B25B1/2442 (US);
B25B11/005 (EP);
B25B11/007 (EP);
B25B5/06 (EP);
B25B5/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON BEHÄLTERN | [2022/08] | English: | MANUFACTURING CONTAINERS | [2022/08] | French: | FABRICATION DE RÉCIPIENTS | [2022/08] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2020 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 20.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4786063 (ENGELHARDT JOHN A [US], et al); | [X]FR2654664 (SALOMON SA [FR]); | [XI]US5425460 (BARBARIAN JOSEPH [US]) |