EP3957400 - NOZZLE FOR SPRAYING CONCRETE OR SIMILAR MATERIAL, PORTIONS OF THE SAME AND STRUCTURE MANUFACTURING APPARATUS USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mobbot SA Route de la Glâne 26 1700 Fribourg / CH | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIBEAUD, Thomas 1700 Fribourg / CH | 02 /
GALÉ, Benjamin 1700 Fribourg / CH | 03 /
PETIT, Agnès 1700 Fribourg / CH | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | KATZAROV S.A. Geneva Business Center 12 Avenue des Morgines 1213 Petit-Lancy / CH | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 20191401.7 | 17.08.2020 | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3957400 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/00 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
B05B7/1481 (EP);
B28B1/001 (US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] |
Former [2022/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DÜSE ZUM SPRÜHEN VON BETON ODER ÄHNLICHEM MATERIAL, TEILE DAVON UND STRUKTURHERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/08] | English: | NOZZLE FOR SPRAYING CONCRETE OR SIMILAR MATERIAL, PORTIONS OF THE SAME AND STRUCTURE MANUFACTURING APPARATUS USING THE SAME | [2022/08] | French: | BUSE DE PULVÉRISATION DE BÉTON OU DE MATÉRIAU SIMILAIRE, PARTIES DE CELLE-CI ET APPAREIL DE FABRICATION DE STRUCTURE À L'AIDE DE CELLE-CI | [2022/08] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 11.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.01.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |