EP3782953 - INDUSTRIAL TRUCK WITH A BUILT-IN CHARGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jungheinrich Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Ebert-Damm 129 22047 Hamburg / DE | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petersen, Marinus Richarda-Huch-Straße 8 24536 Neumünster / DE | 02 /
Wetegrove, Ralf Aurikelstieg 8 22850 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Warncke, Matthias Kirchenhang 5 21073 Hamburg / DE | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [2021/08] | Application number, filing date | 20192092.3 | 21.08.2020 | [2021/08] | Priority number, date | DE201910122659 | 22.08.2019 Original published format: DE102019122659 | [2021/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3782953 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3782953 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/075, B66F9/24, H02M3/335, H02M3/00 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
B66F9/24 (EP,US);
B66F9/07504 (EP);
H02M3/01 (EP,US);
H02M3/33573 (EP,US);
H02M3/33576 (EP);
H02M1/0058 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/08] | B66F9/075, B66F9/24, H02M3/335 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] |
Former [2021/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FLURFÖRDERZEUG MIT EINEM EINBAULADEGERÄT | [2021/08] | English: | INDUSTRIAL TRUCK WITH A BUILT-IN CHARGER | [2021/08] | French: | CHARIOT DE MANUTENTION DOTÉ D'UN CHARGEUR INTÉGRÉ | [2021/08] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 23.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | IT | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | IE | 21.08.2023 | LU | 21.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
IE | 21.08.2023 | ||
LU | 21.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 21.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 21.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 21.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 21.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 26.07.2023 | |
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1657106 (JUNGHEINRICH AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018]; figure - *; | [A]US2011194206 (SASE TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2012163052 (YONEZAWA YU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0099]; figure - *; | [Y]US2016052410 (ZHOU ZHI [US]) [Y] 1,2,8 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035]; figure - *; | [Y]EP3229307 (RAYMOND CORP [US]) [Y] 6-8 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0049]; figure - *; | [Y]US2018123360 (EAVES STEPHEN S [US]) [Y] 3-5,8 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0059]; figure - *; | [A]US2018170207 (KO KYUBEOM [KR]) [A] 4,5* paragraph [0091]; figure - * | by applicant | CN201122859Y | EP2618449 | EP2781012 |