EP3957836 - A METHOD FOR CLEANING A COMPONENT OF AN EXHAUST AFTERTREATMENT SYSTEM AND AN EXHAUST SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO TRUCK CORPORATION 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHWAN, Soran 431 33 Mölndal / SE | 02 /
BLOMGREN, Fredrik 425 35 Hisings Kärra / SE | 03 /
XIE, Kunpeng 414 64 Göteborg / SE | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 20192107.9 | 21.08.2020 | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3957836 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3957836 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/023, F01N9/00, F01N13/00 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
F01N9/00 (EP);
F01N3/033 (CN);
F01N3/0293 (US);
F01N11/002 (CN);
F01N13/008 (EP);
F01N13/009 (CN,US);
F01N13/0097 (CN);
F01N3/023 (CN);
F01N3/0233 (EP);
F01N3/0235 (EP);
F01N3/0238 (EP);
F01N3/035 (CN,US);
F01N3/04 (CN);
F01N3/2066 (CN);
F01N3/2803 (CN);
F01N2260/04 (EP);
F01N2560/00 (EP);
F01N2610/02 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] |
Former [2022/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG EINER ABGASNACHBEHANDLUNGSKOMPONENTE UND ABGASSYSTEM | [2023/19] | English: | A METHOD FOR CLEANING A COMPONENT OF AN EXHAUST AFTERTREATMENT SYSTEM AND AN EXHAUST SYSTEM | [2022/08] | French: | MÉTHODE POUR NETTOYER UN COMPOSANT DE SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DES GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT ET SYSTÈME ASSOCIÉ | [2022/08] |
Former [2022/08] | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON ABGASNACHBEHANDLUNGSKOMPONENT UND ABGASSYSTEM | Examination procedure | 12.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 12.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 10.01.2024 | |
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | HR | 10.01.2024 | |
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 10.04.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 10.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1336729 (ZEUNA STAERKER KG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4-7,10-15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0031]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2003159436 (FOSTER MICHAEL RALPH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] - [0037]; figure 6 *; | [A]US2006144223 (SELLERS CHERYL L [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]EP2270319 (TUNAP IND CHEMIE GMBH & CO PRODUKTIONS KG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4-7,10-15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0030]; figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE102010042035 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2014018883 (SERVAAS LAB INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0102] - [0105]; figures 11E, 11F * | Examination | EP2270319 | by applicant | DE4134949 |