EP3786467 - ERGONOMIC BOX NUT RETAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works INC. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, IL 60025 / US | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCZYNSKI, Gregory George Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview Illinois, 60025 / US | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 20192671.4 | 25.08.2020 | [2021/09] | Priority number, date | US201962892126P | 27.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962892126 P | US202017000104 | 21.08.2020 Original published format: US202017000104 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3786467 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16B37/04 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
F16B37/043 (EP,US);
F16B39/26 (CN);
F16B37/02 (US);
F16B5/0607 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] |
Former [2021/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERGONOMISCHE SCHACHTELFÖRMGE MUTTERNSICHERUNG | [2021/09] | English: | ERGONOMIC BOX NUT RETAINER | [2021/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE ERGONOMIQUE D'ÉCROU EN FORME DE BOITIER | [2021/09] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 04.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004244156 (JACKSON NICHOLAS [US], et al); | [A]US2013202350 (KWON CHOONG HO [KR], et al); | [X]US2016144801 (HUELKE DAVID [US], et al); | [XI]US9562554 (VIDAL DAVID J [CA], et al) |