EP3793210 - A HEARING DEVICE COMPRISING A NOISE REDUCTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOANG, Poul c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | 02 /
DE HAAN, Jan M. c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | 03 /
JENSEN, Jesper c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | 04 /
PEDERSEN, Michael Syskind c/o Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Demant Demant A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 20193005.4 | 27.08.2020 | [2021/11] | Priority number, date | EP20190196675 | 11.09.2019 Original published format: EP 19196675 | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3793210 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/10, H04R1/40, H04R25/00 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
H04R1/1083 (EP,CN,US);
H04R1/10 (CN);
G10K11/17837 (US);
H04R1/1016 (US);
H04R1/406 (EP);
H04R25/00 (CN);
H04R25/405 (EP);
H04R25/505 (US);
G10K2210/1081 (US);
H04R2201/107 (EP);
H04R2225/43 (EP,CN);
H04R2460/00 (CN);
H04R2460/01 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] |
Former [2021/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÖRGERÄT MIT EINEM GERÄUSCHREDUZIERUNGSSYSTEM | [2021/11] | English: | A HEARING DEVICE COMPRISING A NOISE REDUCTION SYSTEM | [2021/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF AUDITIF COMPRENANT UN SYSTÈME DE RÉDUCTION DU BRUIT | [2021/11] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 17.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2014093091 (DUSAN SORIN V [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10,13-15 * the whole document * [Y] 11,12 [I] 7; | [Y]WO2017134300 (GUEDON CHRISTOPHE [FR]) [Y] 11,12* page 16, line 26 - page 17, line 26 * | by applicant | EP2701145 | - U. KJEMSJ. JENSEN, "Maximum likelihood based noise covariance matrix estimation for multimicrophone speech enhancement", 2012 Proceedings of the 20th European Signal Processing Conference (EUSIPCO, (20120800), pages 295 - 299, XP032254727 | - YUJIE GUA. LESHEM, "Robust Adaptive Beamforming Based on Interference Covariance Matrix Reconstruction and Steering Vector Estimation", IEEE Transactions on Signal Processing, (20120700), vol. 60, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TSP.2012.2194289, pages 3881 - 3885, XP011447391 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSP.2012.2194289 | - "Estimation of the noise correlation matrix", RICHARD C. HENDRIKSTIMO GERKMANN, IEEE International Conference on Acoustics, Speech and Signal Processing (ICASSP), Prague, Czech Republic, IEEE, (20110500), pages 4740 - 4743 | - "Multi-channel PSD estimators for speech dereverberation - A theoretical and experimental comparison", ADAM KUKLASINSKISIMON DOCLOTIMO GERKMANNSOREN HOLDT JENSENJESPER JENSEN, IEEE International Conference on Acoustics, Speech and Signal Processing (ICASSP), South Brisbane, Queensland, Australia, IEEE., (20150400), pages 5728 - 5732 | - MEHREZ SOUDENJINGDONG CHENJACOB BENESTYSOFI'ENE AFFES, "An Integrated Solution for Online Multichannel Noise Tracking and Reduction", IEEE Transactions on Audio, Speech, and Language Processing, (20110900), vol. 19, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TASL.2011.2118205, pages 2159 - 2169, XP011337632 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TASL.2011.2118205 | - K.L. BELLY. EPHRAIMH.L. VAN TREES, "A Bayesian approach to robust adaptive beamforming", IEEE Transactions on Signal Processing, (20000200), vol. 48, no. 2, pages 386 - 398 | - MEHDI ZOHOURIANGERALD ENZNERRAINER MARTIN, "Binaural Speaker Localization Integrated Into an Adaptive Beamformer for Hearing Aids", IEEE/ACM Transactions on Audio, Speech, and Language Processing, (20180300), vol. 26, no. 3, doi:10.1109/TASLP.2017.2782491, pages 515 - 528, XP058385030 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TASLP.2017.2782491 | - HAO YED. DEGROAT, "Maximum likelihood DOA estimation and asymptotic Cramer-Rao bounds for additive unknown colored noise", IEEE Transactions on Signal Processing, (19950400), vol. 43, no. 4, pages 938 - 949 |