EP3789163 - LOCKOUT BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABUS August Bremicker Söhne KG Altenhofer Weg 25 58300 Wetter-Volmarstein / DE | [2021/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2021/10] | Application number, filing date | 20193096.3 | 27.08.2020 | [2021/10] | Priority number, date | DE201910123959 | 06.09.2019 Original published format: DE102019123959 | [2021/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3789163 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3789163 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B25H3/02, B65D45/00, E05G1/00 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
B25H3/02 (EP);
A47G29/10 (US);
E05G1/005 (EP,US);
E05G1/02 (EP);
E05G1/026 (US);
E05Y2999/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] |
Former [2021/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSKASTEN | [2021/10] | English: | LOCKOUT BOX | [2021/10] | French: | BOÎTIER DE FERMETURE | [2021/10] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 09.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | IT | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | MC | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | IE | 27.08.2023 | LU | 27.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 26.04.2023 | |
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
LU | 27.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | CZ | 26.04.2023 | |
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
LU | 27.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 26.04.2023 | |
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 26.04.2023 | |
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 26.04.2023 | |
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 26.04.2023 | |
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 26.04.2023 | |
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 26.04.2023 | |
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | PL | 26.04.2023 | |
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | PT | 28.08.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8302516 (KUEHNE JOCHEN) [A] 4-10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2786015 (REUILLON PAUL JACQUES [FR]) [A] 4-10* the whole document *; | [A]DE10136907 (HUPP HUBERT [DE], et al) [A] 4-10 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * figure - *; | [X]US2013099641 (SAUCIER MARIO [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,11-13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0028] * * figure - *; | [XI]US2014130722 (DUDGEON MATTHEW T [US], et al) [X] 1-4,13 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0038] * * figure - * [I] 5-10,14,15; | [XI]US2017113856 (HOLLIS ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-4,13 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0073] * * figure - * [I] 5-10,14,15 | by applicant | DE102014106228 |