EP3816401 - ROTOR ASSEMBLY FOR IN-MACHINE GRINDING OF SHROUD MEMBER AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 855 S. Mint Street Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2022/19] |
Former [2021/18] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 249 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITTENDORF, Donald HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. 115 Tabor Road; M/S 4D3; P.O. Box 249 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 02 /
AMATO, Krista HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. 115 Tabor Road; M/S 4D3; P.O. Box 249 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 03 /
CONKLIN, Nicole HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. 115 Tabor Road; M/S 4D3; P.O. Box 249 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 04 /
LUDWIG, Brent HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. 115 Tabor Road; M/S 4D3; P.O. Box 249 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 05 /
MORRIS, Mark HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. 115 Tabor Road; M/S 4D3; P.O. Box 249 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 06 /
STANLEY, Ryon HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. 115 Tabor Road; M/S 4D3; P.O. Box 249 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 07 /
TILMAN, Donald HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. 115 Tabor Road; M/S 4D3; P.O. Box 249 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 08 /
YUN, Heemann HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. 115 Tabor Road; M/S 4D3; P.O. Box 249 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/18] | Lucas, Peter Lawrence LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House, Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 20193233.2 | 27.08.2020 | [2021/18] | Priority number, date | US201916665964 | 28.10.2019 Original published format: US201916665964 | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3816401 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/20, F01D11/12, F04D29/52 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
F01D11/122 (EP);
F01D5/288 (US);
F01D19/00 (EP);
F01D5/20 (EP);
F04D29/526 (EP);
F05D2230/90 (EP);
F05D2240/30 (US);
F05D2240/307 (EP);
F05D2260/85 (EP);
F05D2300/133 (US);
F05D2300/17 (US);
F05D2300/175 (EP);
F05D2300/2282 (EP,US);
F05D2300/502 (EP);
F05D2300/506 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] |
Former [2021/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROTORANORDNUNG ZUM MASCHINENINTERNEN SCHLEIFEN EINES UMMANTELUNGSELEMENTES UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2021/18] | English: | ROTOR ASSEMBLY FOR IN-MACHINE GRINDING OF SHROUD MEMBER AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME | [2021/18] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE ROTOR POUR LE MEULAGE À L'INTÉRIEUR DE MACHINE D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE VIROLE ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION ASSOCIÉ | [2021/18] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 04.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4169020 (STALKER KENNETH W, et al) [Y] 4-8 * columns 3,4; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US4671735 (ROSSMANN AXEL [DE], et al) [Y] 1,9,10,12,13 * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]GB2225388 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-3,6,7,11-13 * pages 3-6; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US2006062664 (CAMPINO JOHNSON NICOLAS [CH], et al) [X] 1,4-13 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]EP2444514 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 4-8* paragraphs [0026] - [0029]; figure 5 *; | [XY]US2013078084 (GENDRICH CHARLES P [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,11-13 * the whole document * [Y] 5,7-10; | [Y]EP3318719 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 1,6,7,11-13 * paragraph [0038]; figures 2-6 * | by applicant | US2014134353 |