EP3786463 - NO WRAP STRAP FOR DECORATIVE CHRISTMAS LIGHTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kennedy, Stacy L. 2804 Melstone Ct. Mansfield, IL 76063 / US | For all designated states DeCosmo, John 1989 Johns Drive Glenview, IL 60025 / US | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Kalkoff & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 20193429.6 | 28.08.2020 | [2021/09] | Priority number, date | US201962894261P | 30.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962894261 P | US202015929791 | 21.05.2020 Original published format: US202015929791 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3786463 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16B2/08, A47G33/04, F21S4/10, F21V21/08, // F21W121/04 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
F21S4/10 (EP,US);
F21V21/008 (US);
F16B2/08 (EP);
F21V21/0816 (EP);
F21V21/0832 (EP,US);
A47G2033/0827 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMWICKLUNGSFREIES BAND FÜR DEKORATIVE WEIHNACHTSLICHTER | [2021/09] | English: | NO WRAP STRAP FOR DECORATIVE CHRISTMAS LIGHTS | [2021/09] | French: | BRACELET SANS EMBALLAGE POUR GUIRLANDES DE NOËL | [2021/09] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/06] | 27.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4720773 (AHRONI JOSEPH M [US]) [X] 12,13 * column 1, line 57 - column 3, line 31; figure 3 * [A] 1-11; | [XA]US5119528 (ONO MAMORU [JP], et al) [X] 12,13 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 68; figures 1-5b * [A] 1-11; | [A]GB2297580 (NOMA INT INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19716864 (LANGBAUER JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 18; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US7080925 (RUSHING JOHN A [US]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]WO2014189365 (HEMSSON B V [NL]) [A] 1-13 * page 7, line 10 - page 10, line 22; figures 7-9 * |