EP3964656 - URINAL WITH SHOWER FUNCTION FOR THE PENIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walker, Alois Zugerstrasse 34 6314 Unterägeri / CH | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Giesshübelstrasse 62 8045 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/10] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 20194136.6 | 02.09.2020 | [2022/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3964656 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E03D13/00, A61H35/00 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
E03D13/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] |
Former [2022/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | URINAL MIT DUSCHFUNKTION FÜR DEN PENIS | [2022/10] | English: | URINAL WITH SHOWER FUNCTION FOR THE PENIS | [2022/10] | French: | URINOIR AVEC FONCTION DE DOUCHE POUR LE PÉNIS | [2022/10] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 01.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US4180875 (WILSON PORTER C [US]) [X] 1,5,7,10-13 * column 1, lines 7-8; figure 5 * * column 2, lines 43-55 * * column 3, lines 18-26 * [A] 4,6 [I] 2,3,15; | [XAI]JPH09252988 (ISHIWADA YOSHIHIKO) [X] 1,5,7,10,11,14 * paragraph [0006]; figures 1,2 * [A] 4,6 [I] 15; | [IA]JP2000282529 (TOTO LTD) [I] 1-3,7,10,11,15 * figure 1 *[A] 4,6; | [XAI]WO2006018677 (NAKLADAL MIROSLAV [SK]) [X] 1,8,10,11,14 * figures 2,3; claims 1,3 * [A] 4,6 [I] 9,15 |