EP3964706 - A METHOD FOR OPERATING A WIND TURBINE, A METHOD FOR DESIGNING A WIND TURBINE, AND A WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Renovables España S.L. C/ Roc Boronat, 78 08005 Barcelona / ES | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gauchel, Peter 48499 Salzbergen / DE | 02 /
Nies, Jacob Johannes 48499 Salzbergen / DE | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20194166.3 | 02.09.2020 | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3964706 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/04 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
F03D7/0268 (EP);
F03D7/0224 (EP,CN);
F03D7/0264 (US);
F03D15/00 (US);
F03D7/043 (CN);
F03D9/25 (US);
F05B2260/87 (EP);
F05B2270/1077 (EP);
F05B2270/32 (CN);
F05B2270/3201 (EP);
F05B2270/326 (EP);
F05D2220/76 (US);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] |
Former [2022/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER WINDTURBINE, VERFAHREN ZUR KONSTRUKTION EINER WINDTURBINE SOWIE WINDTURBINE | [2022/10] | English: | A METHOD FOR OPERATING A WIND TURBINE, A METHOD FOR DESIGNING A WIND TURBINE, AND A WIND TURBINE | [2022/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE ÉOLIENNE, PROCÉDÉ DE CONCEPTION D'UNE ÉOLIENNE ET ÉOLIENNE | [2022/10] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 08.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1612412 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,6,8,13,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] , [0016] , [0044] ** figure 1 *; | [A]EP2003335 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,6,8,13,14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] - [0012] - [0031] - [0033] *; | [XI]EP2306005 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0011] , [0012] , [0020] , [0022] * [I] 11; | [A]EP2447530 (GAMESA INNOVATION & TECH SL [ES]) [A] 1,6,8,13,14 * paragraphs [0015] , [0019] , [0021] , [0036] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2016377057 (CAPONETTI FABIO [DK], et al) [A] 1,2,6,8,13,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0007] , [0009] , [0015] , [0016] * |