EP3792595 - RESONATOR FIBER OPTIC GYROSCOPE WITH INTEGRATED PHOTONICS INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2021/43] |
Former [2021/11] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUCKETT, Matthew Wade Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 02 /
KRUEGER, Neil A. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | 03 /
SANDERS, Glen A. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2021/43] |
Former [2021/11] | 01 /
PUCKETT, Matthew Wade Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | ||
02 /
KRUEGER, Neil A. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | |||
03 /
SANDERS, Glen A. Intellectual Property Services Group 300 S. Tryon Street, Suite 600 Charlotte, NC North Carolina 28202 / US | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20194200.0 | 02.09.2020 | [2021/11] | Priority number, date | US201916566553 | 10.09.2019 Original published format: US201916566553 | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3792595 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/72, G02B6/30 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
G01C19/727 (EP);
G01C19/723 (US);
G01C19/722 (US);
G02B6/02361 (US);
G02B6/262 (EP);
G02B6/305 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] |
Former [2021/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASEROPTISCHER RESONATORKREISEL MIT INTEGRIERTER PHOTONIK-SCHNITTSTELLE | [2021/11] | English: | RESONATOR FIBER OPTIC GYROSCOPE WITH INTEGRATED PHOTONICS INTERFACE | [2021/11] | French: | GYROSCOPE À FIBRE OPTIQUE DE RÉSONATEUR À INTERFACE PHOTONIQUE INTÉGRÉE | [2021/11] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 16.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015247974 (PAINCHAUD YVES [CA], et al) [Y] 1 * figure 3 *; | [Y]US2015260520 (QIU TIEQUN [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0023] , [0044]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2016356960 (NOVACK ARI [US], et al) [Y] 1* figure 2A *; | [Y] - S H TAO ET AL, "Improving coupling efficiency of fiber-waveguide coupling with a double-tip coupler", OPT. EXPRESS, (20081202), vol. 16, no. 25, doi:10.1364/OE.16.020803, pages 20804 - 20808, XP055691406 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.16.020803 |