EP3799967 - ROCK PROCESSING INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KLEEMANN GMBH Manfred-Wörner-Str. 160 73037 Göppingen / DE | [2021/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELOSEVIC, Vjecoslav Sommerhalde 28 73035 Göppingen / DE | 02 /
BLESSING, Otto Theodor-Wolf-Weg 14 73566 Bartholomä / DE | 03 /
RUDOLPH, Lars Nobileweg 59 70439 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/14] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Jochen Patentanwalt European Patent Attorney Königstrasse 30 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/14] | Application number, filing date | 20194273.7 | 03.09.2020 | [2021/14] | Priority number, date | DE201910126778 | 04.10.2019 Original published format: DE102019126778 | [2021/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3799967 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3799967 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B07B13/16 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
B07B13/16 (EP,US);
B07B1/28 (CN);
B02C23/14 (CN);
B02C23/16 (CN);
B07B1/005 (EP,CN,US);
B07B1/46 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] |
Former [2021/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GESTEINSVERARBEITUNGSANLAGE | [2021/14] | English: | ROCK PROCESSING INSTALLATION | [2021/14] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT DE LA ROCHE | [2021/14] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 01.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | IE | 03.09.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2309923 (ERIN INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LIM [IE]); | [A]WO2006051165 (METSO MINERALS TAMPERE OY [FI], et al); | [A]GB2459287 (DOYLE WILLIAM [IE]); | [A]EP3041610 (METSO MINERALS INC [FI]); | [AD]EP3482836 (SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [SE]); | [E]EP3771493 (KLEEMANN GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | EP3482836 |