EP3964767 - DEVICE FOR COOLING A BEVERAGE COMPRISING A PRIMARY AND A SECONDARY COOLING CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heineken Supply Chain B.V. Tweede Weteringplantsoen 21 1017 ZD Amsterdam / NL | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN GEIJLSWIJK, Petrus Johannes 1017 ZD Amsterdam / NL | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20194442.8 | 03.09.2020 | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3964767 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F25B1/00, F25B25/00, B67D1/08 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
F25B1/00 (EP);
B67D1/0867 (EP,US);
B67D1/0861 (EP);
B67D1/0884 (EP,US);
F25B25/005 (EP,US);
B67D2210/00104 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR KÜHLUNG EINES GETRÄNKS MIT EINEM PRIMÄREN UND SEKUNDÄREN KÜHLKREISLAUF | [2022/10] | English: | DEVICE FOR COOLING A BEVERAGE COMPRISING A PRIMARY AND A SECONDARY COOLING CIRCUIT | [2022/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REFROIDISSEMENT D'UNE BOISSON COMPRENANT UN CIRCUIT DE REFROIDISSEMENT PRIMAIRE ET SECONDAIRE | [2022/10] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/07] | 28.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102008021777 (EUGSTER FRISMAG AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0058] - [0094]; figures 1-7 *; | [XAI]WO2018144436 (COCA COLA CO [US]) [X] 1,2,6-8 * paragraphs [0044] - [0062]; figures 2, 3 * [A] 3,10-15 [I] 4,5,9; | [A]EP3489597 (RIPRUP CO SA [GG]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0006] - [0061]; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP2207459 |