EP3813498 - WIRING BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNADA, Naohiro Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 20194506.0 | 04.09.2020 | [2021/17] | Priority number, date | JP20190193804 | 24.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019193804 | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3813498 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/18, H05K1/11, H05K1/02, H01G2/06, H01G4/40, // H01R12/71 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
H01G4/40 (EP);
H05K1/18 (CN);
H05K1/181 (EP,US);
H01G2/06 (EP);
H05K1/0231 (CN);
H05K1/0271 (EP);
H05K1/111 (EP);
H01G2/065 (EP);
H05K2201/09418 (EP);
H05K2201/10015 (EP,CN,US);
H05K2201/10189 (EP);
H05K2201/10439 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEITERPLATTE | [2021/17] | English: | WIRING BOARD | [2021/17] | French: | CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ | [2021/17] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 30.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US6541711 (DUBE DAVID J [US], et al); | [A]US6862184 (SHI WEIMIN [US], et al); | [A]US2008038945 (KAWAMURA YOSHIHIRO [JP]); | [YD]JP2009218437 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al); | [A]DE102013216322 (DENSO CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP2009218437 |