EP3808881 - CLEANING APPARATUS FOR HEAT DISSIPATION MEMBER OF SPINNING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWASE, Tatsuya c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | 02 /
KITAMURA, Atsushi c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 20194529.2 | 04.09.2020 | [2021/16] | Priority number, date | JP20190188318 | 15.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019188318 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3808881 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D01H1/16, D01H11/00 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
D01H11/00 (EP);
Y02P70/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN WÄRMEABLEITUNGSTEIL EINER SPINNMASCHINE | [2021/16] | English: | CLEANING APPARATUS FOR HEAT DISSIPATION MEMBER OF SPINNING MACHINE | [2021/16] | French: | APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE POUR ÉLÉMENT DE DISSIPATION DE CHALEUR DE MÉTIER À FILER | [2021/16] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 20.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CN205669089U (SAURER (JIANGSU) TEXTILE MACHINERY CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0002] , [0015] - [0025]; figure -; claim - * [Y] 7; | [YA]CN107994488 (CHEN MEIZAN) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0017] - [0027] * [A] 1-6; | [A]WO2006048303 (SAURER GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 1, line 12 - page 4, line 5;; figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO2006066784 (SAURER GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH08170232 |