EP3964591 - HOT-ROLLED STEEL SHEET PRODUCT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HOT-ROLLED STEEL SHEET PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fechte-Heinen, Rainer 46238 Bottrop / DE | 02 /
Kern, Andreas 40885 Ratingen / DE | 03 /
Stötzel, Tim 56566 Neuwied / DE | 04 /
Thiel, Robin 46145 Oberhausen / DE | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | ThyssenKrupp Steel Europe AG Patente/Patent Department Kaiser-Wilhelm-Straße 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20194833.8 | 07.09.2020 | [2022/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3964591 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/02, C22C38/04, C21D9/46, C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/06, C22C38/42, C22C38/44, C22C38/46, C22C38/48, C22C38/50, C22C38/54, C22C38/58 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
C22C38/04 (EP);
C21D8/0226 (EP);
C21D8/0263 (EP);
C21D9/46 (EP);
C22C38/001 (EP);
C22C38/02 (EP);
C22C38/06 (EP);
C22C38/42 (EP);
C22C38/44 (EP);
C22C38/46 (EP);
C22C38/48 (EP);
C22C38/50 (EP);
C22C38/54 (EP);
C22C38/58 (EP);
C21D2211/002 (EP);
C21D2211/008 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] |
Former [2022/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WARMGEWALZTES STAHLFLACHPRODUKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WARMGEWALZTEN STAHLFLACHPRODUKTS | [2022/10] | English: | HOT-ROLLED STEEL SHEET PRODUCT AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HOT-ROLLED STEEL SHEET PRODUCT | [2022/10] | French: | PRODUIT EN ACIER PLAT LAMINÉ À CHAUD ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PRODUIT EN ACIER PLAT LAMINÉ À CHAUD | [2022/10] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 07.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2018134186 (THYSSENKRUPP HOHENLIMBURG GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * pages 8, 10 *; | [X]WO2018108653 (THYSSENKRUPP STEEL EUROPE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]WO2019016041 (THYSSENKRUPP STEEL EUROPE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2576848 | - "Effect of Chemical Compostion on Critical Temperatures of Microalloyed Steels", BORATTO et al., THERMEC '88, Proceedings, Iron and Steel Institute of Japan, (19880000), pages 383 - 390 | - "Prediction of Microstructure and Hardenability in Low Alloy Steels", J.S. KIRKALDY et al., Phase Transformations in Ferrous Alloys, AIME, (19830000), pages 125 - 148 | - K.W. ANDREWS, "Empirical Formulae for the Calculation of Some Transformation, Temperatures", Journal of the Iron and Steel Institute, (19650700), vol. 203, pages 721 - 727, XP055613453 |