EP3797906 - POWDER MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING MOLDED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujimi Incorporated 1-1 Chiryo 2-chome Nishibiwajima-cho Kiyosu-shi, Aichi 452-8502 / JP | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Nobuaki c/o FUJIMI INCORPORATED 1-1, Chiryo 2-chome, Nishibiwajima-cho Kiyosu-shi, Aichi 452-8502 / JP | 02 /
IBE, Hiroyuki c/o FUJIMI INCORPORATED 1-1, Chiryo 2-chome, Nishibiwajima-cho Kiyosu-shi, Aichi 452-8502 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Junya c/o FUJIMI INCORPORATED 1-1, Chiryo 2-chome, Nishibiwajima-cho Kiyosu-shi, Aichi 452-8502 / JP | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 20195479.9 | 10.09.2020 | [2021/13] | Priority number, date | JP20190180440 | 30.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019180440 | [2021/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797906 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/105, C22C1/05, C22C1/10, C22C29/06, C22C29/08, B33Y70/10, B33Y10/00 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
C22C1/051 (EP,US);
B22F1/148 (EP,US);
B22F10/00 (EP,US);
B22F10/28 (EP);
B22F9/026 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y70/10 (EP,US);
C22C29/067 (EP);
C22C29/08 (EP);
B22F2301/15 (US);
B22F2302/10 (US);
B23K15/0086 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] |
Former [2021/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PULVERMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FORMKÖRPERS | [2021/13] | English: | POWDER MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING MOLDED ARTICLE | [2021/13] | French: | MATÉRIAU EN POUDRE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ARTICLE MOULÉ | [2021/13] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 23.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2010012552 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1-5 * comparative example 2;; examples 3, 7, 8 * * table 1 * [A] 6; | [XA]US2015217378 (TATSUOKA SHO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * sample A;; table 1 * * paragraph [0076] * [A] 6; | [XA]KR20170093402 (KJ ALLOY CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054] * [A] 6; | [I]US2018236687 (PRICHARD PAUL D [US], et al) [I] 1-6 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019] *; | [AP]CN110453112 (UNIV GUANGDONG POLYTECHNIC NORMAL) [AP] 1-6* paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0008] * | by applicant | WO2015194678 | JP2017113952 | JP2017114716 | JP2017115194 |