EP3792652 - METHOD FOR ESTIMATING DISTANCE IN AN LPWA NETWORK AND ASSOCIATED METHOD FOR ESTIMATING POSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives 25 Rue Leblanc Bat Le Ponant 75015 Paris / FR | [2024/44] |
Former [2021/11] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLF, Florian c/o CEA 17 rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | 02 /
DE RIVAZ, Sébastien c/o CEA 17 rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | 03 /
DEHMAS, François c/o CEA 17 rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | 04 /
SANA, Mohamed c/o CEA 17 rue des Martyrs 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Brevalex 56, Boulevard de l'Embouchure B.P. 27519 31075 Toulouse Cedex 2 / FR | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 20195598.6 | 10.09.2020 | [2021/11] | Priority number, date | FR20190010164 | 13.09.2019 Original published format: FR 1910164 | [2021/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3792652 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, G01S5/14, G01S13/87, G01S13/84 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
G01S13/876 (EP,US);
G01S13/762 (US);
G01S13/84 (EP);
G06F18/2155 (US);
G06N3/04 (US);
G06N3/08 (US);
G16Y10/75 (US);
G16Y40/60 (US);
G01S5/0273 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR ENTFERNUNGSSCHÄTZUNG IN EINEM LPWA-NETZWERK, UND ENTSPRECHENDE POSITIONSSCHÄTZMETHODE | [2021/11] | English: | METHOD FOR ESTIMATING DISTANCE IN AN LPWA NETWORK AND ASSOCIATED METHOD FOR ESTIMATING POSITION | [2021/11] | French: | MÉTHODE D'ESTIMATION DE DISTANCE DANS UN RÉSEAU LPWA ET MÉTHODE D'ESTIMATION DE POSITION ASSOCIÉE | [2021/11] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 17.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - WOLF FLORIAN ET AL, "Coherent Multi-Channel Ranging for Narrowband LPWAN: Simulation and Experimentation Results", 2018 15TH WORKSHOP ON POSITIONING, NAVIGATION AND COMMUNICATIONS (WPNC), IEEE, (20181025), doi:10.1109/WPNC.2018.8555746, pages 1 - 6, XP033460376 [X] 1,2,6 * figures 1-3 * * sections: I. Introduction II. Coherent Multi-Channel Ranging V.Conclusion * [I] 3-5,7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WPNC.2018.8555746 | [A] - BREGAR KLEMEN ET AL, "Improving Indoor Localization Using Convolutional Neural Networks on Computationally Restricted Devices", IEEE ACCESS, (20180321), vol. 6, doi:10.1109/ACCESS.2018.2817800, pages 17429 - 17441, XP011681588 [A] 1,3,6-8 * figure 5 * * sections: I. Introduction II. Related Work IV.Measurements V. Node Localization VI.NLOS Classification and Ranging Error Estimation using CNN * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACCESS.2018.2817800 | [A] - KOBUS VAN DER MERWE ET AL, "RF-Echo : A Non-Line-of-Sight Indoor Localization System Using a Low-Power Active RF Reflector ASIC Tag", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 23RD ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MOBILE COMPUTING AND NETWORKING , MOBICOM '17, New York, New York, USA, (20171004), doi:10.1145/3117811.3117840, ISBN 978-1-4503-4916-1, pages 222 - 234, XP055694379 [A] 1,3,7 * figures 2, 4, 5 * * sections: 1. Introduction 2. Background 3. Proposed System: RF-Echo * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/3117811.3117840 | by applicant | - "Multi-channel distance measurement with IEEE 802.15.4 (ZigBee) devices", M. PICHLER et al., IEEE Journal of Selected Topics in Signal Processing, (20091000), vol. 3, pages 845 - 859 | - O. BIALER et al., "A deep neural network approach for time-of-arrival estimation in multipath channels", Proc. of ICASSP Conférence, (20180400), doi:10.1109/ICASSP.2018.8461301, pages 2936 - 2940, XP033403821 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2018.8461301 |