EP3832564 - SYSTEMS AND TECHNIQUES FOR AGGREGATION, DISPLAY, AND SHARING OF DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthro Inc. 2505 SE 11th Avenue Suite 354 Portland, OR 97202 / US | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRECO, Michael A. 303 Potter St. Bellingham, WA 98225 / US | 02 /
PULASKI Jr., Michael J. 58 Rue Caulaincourt 75018 Paris / FR | 03 /
HENRICH, Luc A. 5 Villa Brune 75014 Paris / FR | 04 /
BRADLEY, Patrick J. 1376 Newton Avenue Se Atlanta, GA Georgia 30316 / US | 05 /
CHAILLEUX, Alexandre 2 Rue Renée Aspe 31000 Toulouse / FR | 06 /
PHELPS, Steven D. 15650 SW Peachtree Drive Tigard, OR Oregon 97224 / US | 07 /
MATSUMOTO, Ronald Allen 910 Mason Street Bellingham, WA Washington 98225 / US | 08 /
PACINI, David J. 50 Cornell Avenue Larkspur, CA California 94939 / US | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 20196170.3 | 03.09.2016 | [2021/23] | Priority number, date | US201562214077P | 03.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562214077 P | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3832564 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q50/00, G06F12/0866, G06F3/0482, G06F3/0485, G06F12/0862, G06F12/0868, G06F16/9535, G06F16/957 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
G06F3/0485 (EP,US);
G09G5/34 (US);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06F16/9577 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/04845 (US);
G06Q10/06314 (EP,US);
G06Q50/01 (EP,US);
H04L67/5681 (US);
G06F12/0862 (EP,US);
G06F12/0868 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04806 (EP,US);
G06F2212/465 (EP,US);
G06F2212/6024 (EP,US);
G09G2340/045 (US);
G09G2340/0464 (US);
G09G2354/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND TECHNIKEN ZUR AGGREGATION, ANZEIGE UND GEMEINSAMEN NUTZUNG VON DATEN | [2021/23] | English: | SYSTEMS AND TECHNIQUES FOR AGGREGATION, DISPLAY, AND SHARING OF DATA | [2021/23] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET TECHNIQUES POUR L'AGRÉGATION, L'AFFICHAGE ET LE PARTAGE DE DONNÉES | [2021/23] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/20] | 05.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/20] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16778914.8 / EP3345140 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011202866 (HUANG CHEN JE [US], et al); | [I]US2013067420 (PITTAPPILLY THERESA B [US], et al); | [I]US2014310623 (O'CONNELL JR CONLETH S [US], et al); | [A]US2015088679 (VOTAW ELIZABETH S [US], et al); | [A]US2015160834 (LEE JANG-WOO [KR], et al) |