EP3967961 - VAPOUR CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEFFERS, Nick Wicklow, A63YH63 / IE | 02 /
O'CONNEL, Diarmuid Co. Kildare / IE | 03 /
DAVIS, Ian Co. Wicklow / IE | 04 /
AGARWAL, Akshat Co. Meath, C15TVF1 / IE | 05 /
BURNS, Ollie Co. Meath, A82E624 / IE | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20196209.9 | 15.09.2020 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3967961 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F28D15/04, F28D15/02, H01L23/427 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
B22F5/10 (EP);
H05K7/20336 (US);
B33Y80/00 (EP);
F28D15/0233 (EP,US);
F28D15/046 (EP,US);
H01L23/427 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] |
Former [2022/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DAMPFKAMMER | [2022/11] | English: | VAPOUR CHAMBER | [2022/11] | French: | CHAMBRE DE VAPEUR | [2022/11] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 16.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6695040 (KUNG MORISS [TW], et al) [X] 1,6-9,11-13 * column 6, line 52 - column 8, line 2; figures 1-6 * [I] 10; | [X]US2010071879 (HOU CHUEN-SHU [TW]) [X] 1,4 * figures 1-5 *; | [XI]EP2527776 (THERMAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8,12,13,15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033]; figures 3-5 * [I] 14; | [X]US2013112376 (ZHAO YUAN [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 4,7 *; | [X]WO2019131599 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0065]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US10739830 (LEE HAE JIN [KR], et al) [X] 1* figure 2a * |