EP3782610 - SOLID COMPOSITIONS OF TRIGLYCERIDES AND USES TEHREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2023 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ultragenyx Pharmaceutical Inc. 60 Leveroni Court Novato, CA 94949 / US | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLOPP, John 1485 Sanchez Street San Francisco, IL Illinois 94131 / US | 02 /
MORRIS, Gabrielle 448 Ignacio Road 177 Novato, CA California 94949 / US | 03 /
KAKKIS, Emil 546 Biscayne Drive San Rafael, CA California 94901 / US | 04 /
JUNGLES, Steven 216 Douglas Avenue Naperville, IL Illinois 60540 / US | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/08] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 20196269.3 | 14.11.2014 | [2021/08] | Priority number, date | US201361904369P | 14.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361904369 P | [2021/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3782610 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K9/16, A61K31/20, A61K31/23, A61P3/00, A61P9/10, A61P21/02, A61P25/08 | [2021/08] | CPC: |
A61K9/143 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/20 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/23 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/201 (IL,KR);
A61K31/202 (IL,KR);
A61K9/146 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/16 (IL,KR);
A61K9/1611 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/1664 (IL,KR);
A61P21/02 (EP,IL);
A61P25/08 (EP,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] |
Former [2021/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN VON TRIGLYCERIDEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2021/08] | English: | SOLID COMPOSITIONS OF TRIGLYCERIDES AND USES TEHREOF | [2021/08] | French: | COMPOSITIONS SOLIDES DE TRIGLYCÉRIDES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2021/08] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 24.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14861440.7 / EP3068383 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.12.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 28.12.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.01.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006004099 (ROE CHARLES R [US]) [X] 1-13,15-18 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0167] * * paragraph [0171] * [I] 14; | [A]CN101919453 (SUZHOU JIAHE FOODS INDUSTRY CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * embodiments 1-5 ** claim - *; | [XI]WO2011159634 (BAYLOR RES INST [US], et al) [X] 1-13,15-18 * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * * page 1, line 32 - page 2, line 6 * * page 8, line 11 - page 9, line 7 * * page 10, line 22 - page 11, line 36 * * page 12, line 6 - line 9 * * page 14, line 23 - page 16, line 25 * [I] 14 | by applicant | US5968979 | US8106093 | US8404215 | US8642012 |