EP3970896 - ANTI-GLARE WELDING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARCMASK OPTECH CO., LTD No. 9, Ln. 32, Wufu 1st Rd. Luzhu Dist. Taoyuan City / TW | [2022/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSIEH, Chien Hsing Taoyuan City / TW | 02 /
CHEN, Chia Hung Taoyuan City / TW | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2022/12] | Application number, filing date | 20196623.1 | 17.09.2020 | [2022/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3970896 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/32, A61F9/06 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
B23K9/322 (EP);
A61F9/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLENDFREIE SCHWEISSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/12] | English: | ANTI-GLARE WELDING APPARATUS | [2022/12] | French: | APPAREIL DE SOUDAGE ANTI-ÉBLOUISSEMENT | [2022/12] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/10] | 18.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007081250 (GARBERGS BENGT [SE], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * paragraphs [0017] , [0021] - [0029] *; | [X]US6734393 (FRIEDL HELMUT [AT], et al) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2017143548 (LEE DONG HUN [KR]) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - * |