EP3796123 - LOCATING SYSTEM FOR MACHINE TOOLS AND LOCATING METHOD PROVIDED BY SAID SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SPRINGA S.R.L. Via Giovanni Durando 38/A 20158 Milano / IT | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRIFONI, Alessandro Via Allende, 23 40139 BOLOGNA / IT | 02 /
CEVOLI, Davide Via Corticella, 5 40013 CASTEL MAGGIORE (Bologna) / IT | 03 /
MOSCONI, Denis Via Flaminia, 46 47923 RIMINI / IT | 04 /
FRANGI, Lorenzo Via Nazionale dei Giovi, 10 20825 BARLASSINA (Monza Brianza) / IT | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Lunati & Mazzoni S.r.L. Via Carlo Pisacane, 36 20129 Milano / IT | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 20197126.4 | 21.09.2020 | [2021/12] | Priority number, date | IT20190016778 | 19.09.2019 Original published format: IT201900016778 | [2021/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3796123 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3796123 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, G01B11/26, G01B11/00, B23Q9/00, G01B11/02 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
G01B11/26 (EP);
G05B19/19 (CN);
B23Q17/22 (US);
B23Q17/00 (CN);
B23Q9/0007 (EP,US);
G01B11/002 (EP);
G01B11/026 (EP);
G05B19/4083 (CN);
G05B19/4099 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2021/12] | G05D1/02, B23Q9/00, G01B3/11, G01B5/004 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] |
Former [2021/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ORTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR WERKZEUGMASCHINEN UND DURCH DIESES SYSTEM BEREITGESTELLTES ORTUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/12] | English: | LOCATING SYSTEM FOR MACHINE TOOLS AND LOCATING METHOD PROVIDED BY SAID SYSTEM | [2021/12] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LOCALISATION POUR MACHINES-OUTILS ET PROCÉDÉ DE LOCALISATION FOURNI PAR LEDIT SYSTÈME | [2021/12] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 23.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2020 | AL | 25.05.2022 | AT | 25.05.2022 | CY | 25.05.2022 | CZ | 25.05.2022 | DK | 25.05.2022 | EE | 25.05.2022 | ES | 25.05.2022 | FI | 25.05.2022 | HR | 25.05.2022 | LT | 25.05.2022 | LV | 25.05.2022 | MC | 25.05.2022 | MK | 25.05.2022 | MT | 25.05.2022 | NL | 25.05.2022 | PL | 25.05.2022 | RO | 25.05.2022 | RS | 25.05.2022 | SE | 25.05.2022 | SI | 25.05.2022 | SK | 25.05.2022 | SM | 25.05.2022 | TR | 25.05.2022 | BG | 25.08.2022 | NO | 25.08.2022 | GR | 26.08.2022 | IE | 21.09.2022 | LU | 21.09.2022 | IS | 25.09.2022 | PT | 26.09.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 21.09.2020 | |
AL | 25.05.2022 | ||
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CY | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
MK | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
TR | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 21.09.2020 | |
AL | 25.05.2022 | ||
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CY | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
MK | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 21.09.2020 | |
AL | 25.05.2022 | ||
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CY | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CY | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IE | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
LU | 21.09.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1205234 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) [Y] 4 * column 1, line 31 - line 40; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPS6086401 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-10* figures 1-7 *; | [XY]EP3403761 (SPRINGA S R L [IT]) [X] 1-3,5-10 * paragraphs [0084] - [0098] - [ 211] , [ 212] , [ 201]; figures 1-10 * [Y] 4 | by applicant | WO2016051342 | EP20170172084 |