EP3800504 - LIGHT SHUTTER DEVICE INTENDED FOR PROTECTING A CAMERA POSITIONED NEAR THE GLASS PANEL OF A MOTOR VEHICLE AND CORRESPONDING VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 13/15, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2021/14] | For all designated states Renault S.A.S. 13-15 Quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAPRON, Thibault 29 avenue Pierre Curie 78210 Saint Cyr L'ecole / FR | [2021/14] | Representative(s) | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. 1 avenue du Golf FR TCR AVA 055 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 20197171.0 | 21.09.2020 | [2021/14] | Priority number, date | FR20190010961 | 03.10.2019 Original published format: FR 1910961 | [2021/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3800504 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G03B9/26 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
G03B9/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] |
Former [2021/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTABSCHIRMVORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUTZ EINER IN DER NÄHE DER VERGLASUNG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS POSITIONIERTEN KAMERA, UND ENTSPRECHENDES FAHRZEUG | [2021/14] | English: | LIGHT SHUTTER DEVICE INTENDED FOR PROTECTING A CAMERA POSITIONED NEAR THE GLASS PANEL OF A MOTOR VEHICLE AND CORRESPONDING VEHICLE | [2021/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF OBTURATEUR DE LUMIERE DESTINE A PROTEGER UNE CAMERA POSITIONNEE A PROXIMITE DU VITRAGE D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET VEHICULE CORRESPONDANT | [2021/14] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 21.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/33] | 28.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011261462 (HAHN STEFAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8 * the whole document * [I] 4-6,9,10; | [A]US2014226012 (ACHENBACH GARRET [US]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0020]; figures 2,3; claims 1-12 *; | [A]US2014300738 (MUELLER GERHARD [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0035]; figure 1; claims 17-32 * |