EP3805026 - AXLE ASSEMBLY HAVING A MULTI-SPEED TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArvinMeritor Technology, LLC 2135 West Maple Road Troy, MI 48084 / US | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ghatti, Chetankumar ArvinMeritor Technology, LLC 2135 West Maple Road Troy, MI 48084 / US | 02 /
Soffner, Rodrigo Meritor do Brasil Sistemas Automotivos Ltda. Av. João Batista, 825 06097-900 Osasco / BR | 03 /
Keeney, Christopher ArvinMeritor Technology, LLC 2135 West Maple Road Troy, MI 48084 / US | 04 /
Smith, Mark ArvinMeritor Technology, LLC 2135 West Maple Road Troy, MI 48084 / US | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Whitfield, Jack Stephen Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2024/10] |
Former [2021/15] | Whitfield, Jack Stephen Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 20197309.6 | 21.09.2020 | [2021/15] | Priority number, date | US201916594932 | 07.10.2019 Original published format: US201916594932 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3805026 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3805026 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60K1/00, F16H3/089, B60B35/12 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
F16H3/089 (EP);
B60K17/165 (CN,US);
F16H3/126 (US);
B60K1/00 (EP,CN,US);
B60K17/24 (US);
F16H48/05 (US);
B60B35/122 (EP);
B60K2001/001 (EP);
B60Y2400/421 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] |
Former [2021/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ACHSANORDNUNG MIT MEHRGANGGETRIEBE | [2021/15] | English: | AXLE ASSEMBLY HAVING A MULTI-SPEED TRANSMISSION | [2021/15] | French: | ENSEMBLE ESSIEU AYANT UNE TRANSMISSION MULTI-VITESSES | [2021/15] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 13.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102011110258 (NEUMAYER TEKFOR HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [Y] 12-15 * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]WO2014079746 (VALTRA OY AB [FI]) [Y] 11-15* figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2015126719 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [Y] 12-15 * figure 6 *; | [Y]EP3276203 (JING-JIN ELECTRIC TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 11-15 * figure 7 *; | [XYI]EP3501867 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-11 * figure 1; claim 3 * [Y] 11-15 [I] 4,11-15 | by applicant | US2019054816 |