EP3795369 - HUB DESIGNED TO BE INSTALLED IN ROTATION ABOUT AN AXIS RELATIVE TO A FIXED MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Europe 1 rue des Usines 74000 Annecy / FR | [2024/09] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states NTN-SNR ROULEMENTS 1 rue des Usines 74000 Annecy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINEZ, Solène 95 rue des Faneurs 73100 Gresy sur Aix / FR | 02 /
POURROY-SOLARI, Vincent Le Pessey Allée des Nantets 74230 Thones / FR | 03 /
MINEUR, Axel NTN-SNR ROULEMENTS 1 rue des Usines BP2017 74010 Annecy Cedex / FR | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Sayettat, Julien Christian Strato-IP 63, Boulevard de Ménilmontant 75011 Paris / FR | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 20197569.5 | 22.09.2020 | [2021/12] | Priority number, date | FR20190010468 | 23.09.2019 Original published format: FR 1910468 | [2021/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3795369 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60B3/16, B60B27/00, F16D65/12 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
B60B27/0052 (EP);
B60B3/16 (EP);
F16D65/123 (EP);
B60B2900/111 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] |
Former [2021/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NABE ZUR MONTAGE IN ROTATION UM EINE ACHSE IN BEZUG AUF EIN FESTSTEHENDES ORGAN | [2021/12] | English: | HUB DESIGNED TO BE INSTALLED IN ROTATION ABOUT AN AXIS RELATIVE TO A FIXED MEMBER | [2021/12] | French: | MOYEU DESTINÉ À ÊTRE MONTÉ EN ROTATION AUTOUR D'UN AXE PAR RAPPORT À UN ORGANE FIXE | [2021/12] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 21.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0834670 (SKF IND SPA [IT]); | [A]EP1500524 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP]); | [AD]WO2018134384 (HIRSCHVOGEL UMFORMTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | WO2018134384 |