EP3974300 - PORTABLE LIGHT EMITTING SIGNAL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sänger GmbH Zeller Weg 30 74575 Schrozberg / DE | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sänger, Chula 74575 Schrozberg / DE | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Mollekopf, Gerd Willi Kahler Käck Mollekopf Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 20197653.7 | 23.09.2020 | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3974300 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B62J6/057, A42B3/04, B60Q1/26, B62J6/26 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
B62J6/057 (EP);
B60Q1/2673 (EP);
B62J6/26 (EP);
A42B3/0453 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] |
Former [2022/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARES LICHTEMITTIERENDES SIGNALGERÄT | [2022/13] | English: | PORTABLE LIGHT EMITTING SIGNAL APPARATUS | [2022/13] | French: | APPAREIL DE SIGNAL ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT PORTABLE | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 28.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017109992 (LIN MICHELLE JING [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-10,12-15 * the whole document * [I] 6,7,11; | [XI]US2005134439 (MOORE DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10,12-15 * the whole document * [I] 7,11; | [XI]EP2521425 (LEE MYUNG SU [KR]) [X] 1-5,8-10,12-15 * the whole document * [I] 6,7,11; | [XI]US2014210609 (YANG CHAN-YUN [TW]) [X] 1-5,10,12-15 * the whole document * [I] 6,7,11; | [XI]US2013329439 (HELLKAMP MARTIN EDWARD [US]) [X] 1-6,9,12-15 * the whole document * [I] 6,7 |