EP3974351 - DIVIDER CONVEYOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Logi Concept Engineering B.V. Deventer Kunstweg 5 7156 NW Beltrum / NL | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brinkers, Joep Hendrik 7152 KV Eibergen / NL | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob Inaday Patent B.V. Hengelosestraat 141 7521 AA Enschede / NL | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 20197766.7 | 23.09.2020 | [2022/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3974351 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65G17/08, B65G17/48, B65G47/64 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
B65G47/648 (EP);
B65G17/08 (EP);
B65G17/48 (EP);
B65G23/06 (EP);
B65G47/642 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] |
Former [2022/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEILERFÖRDERER | [2022/13] | English: | DIVIDER CONVEYOR | [2022/13] | French: | TRANSPORTEUR DIVISEUR | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 28.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/13] | 30.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0820943 (DIXIE UNION GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 2 * pages 1-3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1818293 (L M S P A [IT]) [A] 1* pages 1-4; figures 1-9 *; | [YA]DE102006014182 (TRAPO AG [DE]) [Y] 1,6,7 * pages 1,2; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-5; | [YDA]EP2722295 (LOGI CONCEPT B V [NL]) [YD] 1,6,7 * pages 1,2; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-5 | by applicant | EP2722295 |