EP3806128 - ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUDA, Akihiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NISHIYAMA, Machiko c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/46] |
Former [2021/15] | 01 /
OKUDA, Akihiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
NISHIYAMA, Machiko c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 20198063.8 | 24.09.2020 | [2021/15] | Priority number, date | JP20190184642 | 07.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019184642 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3806128 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01H50/14 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
H01H50/14 (EP,CN);
H01H50/041 (CN);
H01H50/023 (CN);
H01H50/54 (CN);
H01H50/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] |
Former [2021/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES RELAIS | [2021/15] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY | [2021/15] | French: | RELAIS ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE | [2021/15] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 13.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3462472 (TYCO ELECTRONICS COMPONENTES ELECTROMECANICOS LDA [PT]); | [X]CN108172468B ; | [AP]US2020266018 (MOCHIZUKI MASAHIDE [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2012104277 |