EP3939623 - STERILE COVER FOR A MIXED REALITY (MR) DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HCL Technologies Limited 806, Siddharth, 96 Nehru Place New Delhi 110019 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states HCL Technologies Limited 806 Siddharth 96 Nehru Place New Delhi 110019 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEHERA, Sanjeeb 562106 Bangalore / IN | 02 /
BALASUBRAMANIAN, Karthik 600119 Chennai / IN | 03 /
MANI, Dipumon 562106 Bangalore / IN | [2022/03] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A., et al Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20198525.6 | 25.09.2020 | [2022/03] | Priority number, date | IN202011030718 | 18.07.2020 Original published format: IN202011030718 | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3939623 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/26, A61F9/02, G02B27/00, G02B27/01 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
A61L2/26 (EP);
A61B46/10 (US);
A61B34/25 (US);
A61B46/40 (US);
A61B90/36 (US);
G02B27/0006 (EP);
G02B27/0176 (EP);
A61B2090/364 (US);
A61B2090/502 (US);
G02B2027/0154 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STERILE ABDECKUNG FÜR EINE VORRICHTUNG MIT GEMISCHTER REALITÄT | [2022/03] | English: | STERILE COVER FOR A MIXED REALITY (MR) DEVICE | [2022/03] | French: | COUVERCLE STÉRILE POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE RÉALITÉ MIXTE (MR) | [2022/03] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2020 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 19.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS5543405U ; | [X]US6019468 (ALTEMARE JR KENNETH D [US]); | [X]US2008250538 (SALADINO GREGORY [US]); | [X]EP3167854 (REVISION MILITARY INC [CA]) |