EP3821881 - DELAYED RELEASE COMPOSITIONS OF LINACLOTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 22.03.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 100 Summer Street, Suite 2300 Boston, MA 02110 / US | For all designated states Forest Laboratories Holdings Limited Victoria Place, 5th Floor 31 Victoria Street Hamilton / BM | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRETZEN, Angelika 7 Avon Street Somerville, MA Massachusetts 02143 / US | 02 /
CURRIE, Mark G. 197 8th Street, PH21 Boston, MA Massachusetts 02129 / US | 03 /
HASHASH, Ahmad 5 Oland Lane Southborough, MA Massachusetts 01772 / US | 04 /
DEDHIYA, Mahendra 1 Lea Court Pomona, NY New York 10970 / US | 05 /
MO, Yun 60 Fairfield Way Apt. 1 Commack, NY New York 11725 / US | 06 /
CHHETTRY, Anil 11 Hickory Hill Drive Holtsville, NY New York 11742 / US | 07 /
MILLER, Matthew 501 Harrison Street Apt. 416W Hoboken, NJ New Jersey 07030-6480 / US | 08 /
SANGHVI, Ritesh 40 Fairfield Way Apt. 12 Commack, NY New York 11725 / US | 09 /
BARI, Mohammad Mafruhul 14 Virginia Road Lake Grove, NY New York 11755 / US | 10 /
GRILL, Andreas 5 June Street Hauppauge, NY New York 11788 / US | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Drywood, Rosalind Aerona, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 20198666.8 | 11.12.2014 | [2021/20] | Priority number, date | US201361914951P | 11.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361914951 P | US201361914952P | 11.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361914952 P | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3821881 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K9/28, A61K38/10, A61P1/00, A61P1/04, A61P1/10, A61P1/14, A61P35/00 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
A61K38/10 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/2846 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/1611 (IL,US);
A61K9/1617 (IL,US);
A61K9/1635 (IL,US);
A61K9/1652 (IL,US);
A61K9/1676 (IL,US);
A61K9/2009 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/2013 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,IL);
A61K9/2027 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,IL);
A61K9/284 (IL,US);
A61K9/2886 (IL,KR,US);
A61K9/4808 (IL,US);
A61K9/4825 (IL,US);
A61K9/485 (IL,US);
A61K9/4858 (IL,US);
A61K9/4866 (IL,US);
A61K9/4891 (IL,KR,US);
A61K9/5026 (IL,KR,US);
A61K9/5042 (IL,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP,IL);
A61P1/04 (EP,IL);
A61P1/10 (EP,IL);
A61P1/14 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL);
A61K2300/00 (IL,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/10, A61K2300/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] |
Former [2021/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 17.02.2022 | ME | 17.02.2022 | Title | German: | VERZÖGERT FREIGESETZTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS LINACLOTID | [2021/20] | English: | DELAYED RELEASE COMPOSITIONS OF LINACLOTIDE | [2021/20] | French: | COMPOSITIONS À LIBÉRATION RETARDÉE DE LINACLOTIDE | [2021/20] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 17.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 17.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14824655.6 / EP3079669 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees SK, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, TR, SM, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 17.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 17.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.02.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 17.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 17.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.02.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 17.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 17.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.02.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2010019266 (IRONWOOD PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15,17-19 * page 8, lines 3-17 * * page 14, lines 1-25 * * page 19, lines 12-19 * * page 20, lines 22-29 * * page 31 - page 33; example 26 * * page 40 - page 41; example 56 *; | [A]WO2011020054 (IRONWOOD PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 2, paragraph l - page 3, paragraph l * * page 4, paragraph l * * page 7, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 17, paragraph 8 - page 20, paragraph 1 * * claims 1-211 *; | [A]US2011059903 (FRETZEN ANGELIKA [US], et al) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [A]WO2012034068 (IRONWOOD PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2013025969 (IRONWOOD PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 2, paragraph 9 * * page 3, paragraph 12 * * page 12, paragraph 56 - page 25, paragraph 108 * * page 28, paragraph 131 * * page 29, paragraph 134 - page 30, paragraph 145 * * claims 1-81 *; | [A]WO2013047795 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP]) [A] 1-19 * page 7, paragraph 14 - page 8, paragraph 14 * * page 25 - page 27; example 2 * * page 30 - page 34; examples 8,9 * * page 34 - page 35; comparative example 1 *; | [I] - BLOMAIN ERIK S ET AL, "Translating colorectal cancer prevention through the guanylyl cyclase C signaling axis", EXPERT REVIEW OF CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (20130901), vol. 6, no. 5, ISSN 1751-2441, pages 557 - 564, XP008175159 [I] 16 * abstract * * page 561, column l, paragraph 2 - page 561, column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/17512433.2013.827406 | by applicant | US7304036 | US7371727 |