EP3974051 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING A CHEMICAL REACTION IN A CONTROLLABLE MANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde GmbH Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lang, Christian 81479 München / DE | 02 /
Hofstätter, Martin 81369 München / DE | 03 /
Zellhuber, Dr. Mathieu 82152 Martinsried / DE | 04 /
Wellenhofer, Anton 82069 Hohenschäftlarn / DE | 05 /
Stegemann, Robert 81543 München / DE | 06 /
Reiser, Peter 82541 Münsing / DE | 07 /
Fleischmann, Niklas 81373 München / DE | 08 /
Ziegler, Christian 80636 München / DE | 09 /
Posselt, Dr. Heinz 83043 Bad Aibling / DE | 10 /
Delhomme-Neudecker, Dr. Clara 81825 München / DE | 11 /
Shustov, Andrey 67059 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | 12 /
Jenne, Eric 67454 Hassloch / DE | 13 /
Kühn, Heinz-Jürgen 67593 Westhofen / DE | 14 /
Kochendörfer, Kiara Aenne 68159 Mannheim / DE | 15 /
Laib, Dr. Heinrich 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 16 /
Jacob, Reiner 67691 Hochspeyer / DE | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/13] | DehnsGermany Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20198794.8 | 28.09.2020 | [2022/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3974051 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/06, B01J19/24 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
B01J8/067 (EP,KR,US);
B01J19/243 (EP,KR,US);
B01J19/2415 (EP);
B01J2208/00389 (EP,KR);
B01J2208/00415 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2219/00132 (EP,KR);
B01J2219/00135 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REGELBAREN DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER CHEMISCHEN REAKTION | [2022/13] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING A CHEMICAL REACTION IN A CONTROLLABLE MANNER | [2022/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION RÉGLABLE D'UNE RÉACTION CHIMIQUE | [2022/13] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/11] | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102011077970 (WACKER CHEMIE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0076] ** claim 7 *; | [YD]DE102015004121 (LINDE AG [DE]) [YD] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0045]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2020035575 (BASF SE [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 7, line 9 - line 24 * * page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 15 * * page 10, line 16 - line 20 * * page 14, line 21 - line 38; claims 1, 6, * | by applicant | WO2015197181 | EP3075704 | DE102015004121 |