EP3929426 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING LOW-PRESSURE EXHAUST GAS RECIRCULATION SYSTEM FOR FREEZING PREVENTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2022 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYUNDAI MOTOR COMPANY 12, Heolleung-ro, Seocho-gu Seoul 06797 / KR | For all designated states Kia Corporation 12, Heolleung-ro Seocho-gu Seoul 06797 / KR | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jin Ha 06797 Seoul / KR | [2021/52] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20198930.8 | 29.09.2020 | [2021/52] | Priority number, date | KR20200075603 | 22.06.2020 Original published format: KR 20200075603 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3929426 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F02M26/06, F02D41/00, // B60W30/18, F02B29/04, F02D41/12 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
F02M26/06 (EP,KR,US);
F02D41/22 (KR);
F02D41/0052 (CN);
B60W30/18072 (EP);
F02D41/0047 (EP);
F02D41/0065 (EP,KR);
F02D41/0072 (US);
F02D41/2429 (KR);
F02D41/2445 (CN);
F02M26/33 (EP,US);
B60Y2400/442 (EP);
F02B29/0493 (EP);
F02D2200/0414 (EP,CN);
F02D41/12 (EP);
F02M2026/003 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES NIEDERDRUCK-ABGASRÜCKFÜHRUNGSSYSTEMS ZUR FROSTVERHINDERUNG | [2021/52] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING LOW-PRESSURE EXHAUST GAS RECIRCULATION SYSTEM FOR FREEZING PREVENTION | [2021/52] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE SYSTÈME DE RECIRCULATION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT BASSE PRESSION POUR LA PRÉVENTION DU GEL | [2021/52] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/49] | 20.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]FR2903735 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [Y] 1,3-6 * page 6, line 4 - page 7, line 9; figures 1-4 *[A] 2; | [YA]US2016326972 (KIM SEUNG HWAN [KR], et al) [Y] 1,3-6 * paragraph [0010]; figure 1 * [A] 2; | [YA]US2017306898 (KIM MINSU [KR]) [Y] 1,3-6 * paragraphs [0018] - [0024]; figures 1-3 * [A] 2; | [YA]US2019376476 (SMILJANOVSKI VANCO [DE], et al) [Y] 1,3-6 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0 29] , [0 41] - [0066]; figures 1-4 * [A] 2 |