EP3836420 - METHOD FOR BEAMFORMING WEIGHTS TRANSMISSION OVER O-RAN FRONTHAUL INTERFACE IN C-RANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mavenir Networks, Inc. 1700 International Pkwy Suite 200 Richardson, TX 75081 / US | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahmed, Wessam Mahmoud Afifi 2300 Kathryn Ln Apt. 116 Plano, Texas 75025 / US | 02 /
Nam, Young-Han 3821 Elgin Drive Plano, Texas 75025 / US | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Scintilla Intellectual Property Ltd Suite 2.1 145 St. Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5JF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/24] | Scintilla Intellectual Property Ltd The Centrum Building 38 Queen Street Glasgow G1 3DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 20199049.6 | 29.09.2020 | [2021/24] | Priority number, date | US201962930123P | 04.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962930123 P | US201962940453P | 26.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962940453 P | [2021/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3836420 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04B1/00 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04B7/0634 (US);
H04W72/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] |
Former [2021/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STRAHLFORMUNGSGEWICHTSÜBERTRAGUNG ÜBER EINE O-RAN-FRONTHAUL-SCHNITTSTELLE IN C-RANS | [2021/24] | English: | METHOD FOR BEAMFORMING WEIGHTS TRANSMISSION OVER O-RAN FRONTHAUL INTERFACE IN C-RANS | [2021/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE FAISCEAUX DE TRANSMISSION DE POIDS SUR UNE INTERFACE FRONTHAUL O-RAN DANS DES C-RAN | [2021/24] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 08.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/11] | 14.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |