EP3979299 - DEVICE FOR CONTOLLING TRAPPED IONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies Austria AG Siemensstr. 2 9500 Villach / AT | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROESSLER, Clemens 9500 Villach / AT | 02 /
AUCHTER, Silke 9500 Villach / AT | 03 /
ROESSLER, Johanna Elisabeth 9500 Villach / AT | 04 /
STOCKER, Gerald Finkenstein 9584 / AT | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Lambsdorff & Lange Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Grillparzerstraße 12A 81675 München / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20199366.4 | 30.09.2020 | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3979299 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/00, B82Y10/00, G06N10/00, H01J49/42 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
H01J49/0018 (EP,US);
H01J49/424 (US);
H01J49/4225 (EP);
B82Y10/00 (EP);
G06N10/40 (EP);
G21K1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] |
Former [2022/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG VON EINGEFANGENEN IONEN | [2022/14] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONTOLLING TRAPPED IONS | [2022/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR COMMANDER DES IONS PIÉGÉS | [2022/14] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 27.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6870158 (BLAIN MATTHEW G [US]); | [XYI]US7154088 (BLAIN MATTHEW G [US], et al); | [A]WO2007052273 (UNIV BEN GURION [IL], et al); | [Y]GB2493276 (BRUKER DALTONIK GMBH [DE]); |