EP3979584 - SECURITY NETWORK OF CONNECTED VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Comfort and Driving Assistance 6 rue Daniel Costantini 94000 Créteil / FR | [2024/01] |
Former [2023/19] | For all designated states Valeo Comfort and Driving Assistance 6 Rue Daniel Costantini 94000 Créteil / FR | ||
Former [2022/14] | For all designated states Valeo Comfort and Driving Assistance 76, rue Auguste Perret ZI Europarc 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALVEZ, Frederic 94046 Créteil CEDEX / FR | 02 /
JOUVRAY, Christophe 94046 Créteil CEDEX / FR | 03 /
VENELLE, Benjamin 94046 Créteil CEDEX / FR | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Delaval, Guillaume Laurent Valeo Comfort and Driving Assistance 6 rue Daniel Costantini 94000 Créteil / FR | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20199379.7 | 30.09.2020 | [2022/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3979584 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G06F21/55, H04L29/08 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
H04L63/18 (EP);
G06F21/554 (EP);
H04L63/0209 (EP);
H04L63/1408 (EP);
H04L63/1441 (EP);
H04L67/12 (EP);
G06F2221/034 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] |
Former [2022/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSNETZWERK EINES VERBUNDENEN FAHRZEUGS | [2022/14] | English: | SECURITY NETWORK OF CONNECTED VEHICLE | [2022/14] | French: | RÉSEAU DE SÉCURITÉ DE VÉHICULE CONNECTÉ | [2022/14] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 06.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3291119 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 11,14,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0049] *[I] 12,13; | [XI]US2019190703 (LEKKAS PANAYOTIS [US]) [X] 11,14,15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0055] * [I] 12,13; | [XI]US2019281052 (LEKKAS PANAYOTIS [US]) [X] 1-3,6-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0075] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 4,5 |