EP3806314 - INVERTER FOR AN ALTERNATING CURRENT GRID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIT Austrian Institute of Technology GmbH Giefinggasse 4 1210 Wien / AT | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAKOSCHITZ, Markus Kopfstetten 92 2305 Kopfstetten / AT | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Patentanwälte OG Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | [2024/26] |
Former [2021/15] | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 20200443.8 | 07.10.2020 | [2021/15] | Priority number, date | AT20190050857 | 08.10.2019 Original published format: AT 508572019 | [2021/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3806314 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3806314 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/48, H02M7/493, H02M1/088, H02M7/487, H02M1/00 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
H02M7/48 (EP,AT,US);
G05F1/563 (AT);
H02M1/088 (EP);
H02M7/487 (EP);
H02M7/493 (EP,AT,US);
H02M1/0054 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] |
Former [2021/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | UMRICHTER FÜR EIN WECHSELSTROMNETZ | [2021/15] | English: | INVERTER FOR AN ALTERNATING CURRENT GRID | [2021/15] | French: | ONDULEUR POUR UN RÉSEAU DE COURANT ALTERNATIF | [2021/15] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 08.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 23.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.12.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.01.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002078104 (NIPPON YUSOKI CO LTD); | [X]EP2117121 (SCHLEIFRING UND APPBAU GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP3188355 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [X]US2018102649 (DEWA TETSUYA [JP]); | [X]EP3518400 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) | Examination | US2015131348 |