EP3792682 - DISPLAY SYSTEM WITH OPTICAL ELEMENTS FOR IN-COUPLING MULTIPLEXED LIGHT STREAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magic Leap, Inc. 7500 West Sunrise Boulevard Plantation, FL 33322 / US | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLUG, Michael Anthony 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, FL 33322 / US | 02 /
SCHOWENGERDT, Brian T. 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Michael Nevin 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | 04 /
SINGH, Vikramjit 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | 05 /
PEROZ, Christophe 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | 06 /
ST HILAIRE, Pierre 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | 07 /
SUN, Jie 7500 W. Sunrise Blvd. Plantation, Florida 33322 / US | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 20200714.2 | 14.06.2016 | [2021/11] | Priority number, date | US201562175994P | 15.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562175994 P | US201562180551P | 16.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562180551 P | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3792682 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3792682 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, G02B1/00 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
G02B1/002 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G02B5/3016 (CN,IL,KR,US);
G02B27/0172 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G02B26/103 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G02B27/0081 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G02B27/1006 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G02B27/283 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G02B27/4272 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G02B5/1809 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G02B5/1833 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G02B6/0016 (CN,IL,KR,US);
G02B6/004 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G02B6/0076 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
G02F1/1303 (EP,CN,IL,US);
G02F1/1326 (CN,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] |
Former [2021/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANZEIGESYSTEM MIT OPTISCHEN ELEMENTEN ZUR EINKOPPLUNG VON MULTIPLEXING-LICHTSTRÖMEN | [2021/11] | English: | DISPLAY SYSTEM WITH OPTICAL ELEMENTS FOR IN-COUPLING MULTIPLEXED LIGHT STREAMS | [2021/11] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE AVEC ÉLÉMENTS OPTIQUES POUR LE COUPLAGE DE FLUX DE LUMIÈRE MULTIPLEXÉ | [2021/11] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 13.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16812263.8 / EP3308220 | Divisional application(s) | EP23190001.0 / EP4249965 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015062715 (YAMADA FUMIKA [JP], et al); | [A]JP2015099238 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | by applicant | US8076386 | WO2014036537 | US2014140653 |