EP3981854 - LIGHT EMITTING COMPONENT AND LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avantama AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2022/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÜCHINGER, Norman 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | E. Blum & Co. AG Franklinturm Hofwiesenstrasse 349 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/15] | E. Blum & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 20200906.4 | 08.10.2020 | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3981854 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/02, C07F7/21, C07F7/24, C09K11/56, C09K11/66, C09K11/70, C09K11/88, H05B33/14, H05B33/20 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
C09K11/664 (EP,KR);
H01L33/502 (EP,KR);
G02F1/133614 (EP,KR,US);
C07F7/21 (EP);
C07F7/24 (EP);
C09K11/02 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/025 (EP);
C09K11/06 (US);
C09K11/565 (EP,KR);
C09K11/70 (EP,KR);
C09K11/883 (EP,KR);
G02F1/133603 (US);
G02F1/133606 (US);
G02F1/133608 (US);
H01L25/0753 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDE KOMPONENTE UND LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/15] | English: | LIGHT EMITTING COMPONENT AND LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE | [2022/15] | French: | COMPOSANT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT | [2022/15] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/12] | 04.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017186922 (KIM TAE HYUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,3-9,11-14 * example 1 * * the whole document *; | [A]WO2017108568 (AVANTAMA AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * example 3 * * claim 1 * * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2017195062 (UNIV KING ABDULLAH SCI & TECH [SA]) [X] 1,3-9,11-14 * example 2 * * the whole document * [I] 2,10; | [X]WO2018146561 (UNIV KING ABDULLAH SCI & TECH [SA]) [X] 1,3-9,11-14 * example 3 * * the whole document *; | [A]WO2020130592 (SEOUL NAT UNIV R&DB FOUNDATION [KR]) [A] 1-15 * example 1 ** the whole document * | by applicant | WO2018028869 |