EP3981500 - A GAS SEPERATION SYSTEM AND GAS SEPERATION METHOD COMPRISING A MEMBRANE SYSTEM HAVING A CONTROL VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/15] | A GAS SEPARATION SYSTEM AND GAS SEPARATION METHOD COMPRISING A MEMBRANE SYSTEM HAVING A CONTROL VALVE | ||
[2022/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 12M Invent GmbH Bahnhofstr. 5 91245 Simmelsdorf / DE | [2023/16] |
Former [2022/15] | For all designated states NeuroBodyTech GmbH Waldstrasse 22 83132 Pittenhart im Chiemgau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEEFELDT, Kai 83132 Pittenhart im Chiemgau / DE | [2022/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/15] | Application number, filing date | 20200977.5 | 09.10.2020 | [2022/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3981500 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3981500 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/22, B01D53/26, A63B23/18 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
B01D53/226 (EP,US);
A61M16/101 (US);
A61M16/105 (US);
A61M16/16 (US);
A61M16/20 (US);
B01D53/268 (EP,US);
B01D65/00 (US);
B01D2053/223 (US);
B01D2256/12 (EP,US);
B01D2256/22 (US);
B01D2257/102 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP);
B01D2258/06 (EP);
B01D2259/4533 (EP);
B01D2311/04 (US);
B01D2311/06 (US);
B01D2311/13 (US);
B01D2311/16 (US);
B01D2311/246 (US);
B01D2311/251 (US);
B01D2311/2521 (US);
B01D2313/083 (US);
B01D2313/24 (US);
B01D2317/025 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] | Title | German: | GASTRENNSYSTEM UND GASTRENNVERFAHREN MIT EINEM MEMBRANSYSTEM UND EINEM REGELVENTIL | [2022/15] | English: | A GAS SEPERATION SYSTEM AND GAS SEPERATION METHOD COMPRISING A MEMBRANE SYSTEM HAVING A CONTROL VALVE | [2022/46] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION DE GAZ COMPRENANT UN SYSTÈME DE MEMBRANES ET UNE VANNE DE CONTRÔLE | [2022/15] |
Former [2022/15] | A GAS SEPARATION SYSTEM AND GAS SEPARATION METHOD COMPRISING A MEMBRANE SYSTEM HAVING A CONTROL VALVE | Examination procedure | 07.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 07.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2023 | CZ | 21.06.2023 | DK | 21.06.2023 | EE | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | FI | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | IT | 21.06.2023 | LT | 21.06.2023 | LV | 21.06.2023 | MC | 21.06.2023 | NL | 21.06.2023 | PL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SE | 21.06.2023 | SI | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | PT | 23.10.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
IT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012000355 (SHARMA BHARGAV [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 4 *; | [A]US2015352403 (AHMAD ALI [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 7 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0006] *; | [A]GB2553790 (SPORTING EDGE UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * page 1, line 3 - line 26 * * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 12 *; | [A]WO2019141909 (TOTAL SA [FR]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1a, 1b *; | [A]US2020297964 (BOULANGER THIERRY [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0002] - [0010] - [ 0083] - [0096] * |