EP3822420 - TAP WITH MIXER AND CONNECTION SYSTEM, FOR USE AS A HIGH-PRESSURE OR LOW-PRESSURE FAUCET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/20] | CONNECTION SYSTEM FOR A TAP WITH MIXING BATTERY FOR USE AS A HIGH-PRESSURE OR LOW-PRESSURE FITTING | ||
[2023/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Al Mstrehi, Rafat Anne-Frank-Ring 68 48565 Steinfurt / DE | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Pelster Behrends Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Bosch-Straße 17b 48153 Münster / DE | [2023/35] |
Former [2021/20] | Pelster Behrends Patentanwälte PartG mbB Haus Sentmaring 17 48151 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 20201963.4 | 15.10.2020 | [2021/20] | Priority number, date | DE201920106298U | 12.11.2019 Original published format: DE 202019106298 U | [2021/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3822420 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3822420 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/04, E03C1/044 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
E03C1/04 (EP);
E03C1/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] |
Former [2021/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WASSERHAHN MIT MISCHBATTERIE UND ANSCHLUSSSYSTEM,ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS HOCHDRUCK- ODER NIEDERDRUCKARMATUR | [2023/14] | English: | TAP WITH MIXER AND CONNECTION SYSTEM, FOR USE AS A HIGH-PRESSURE OR LOW-PRESSURE FAUCET | [2023/14] | French: | UN ROBINET DE MÉLANGEUR ET UN SYSTÈME DE RACCORDEMENT, DESTINÉS À L'UTILISATION COMME ROBINETTERIE HAUTE PRESSION OU BASSE PRESSION | [2023/14] |
Former [2021/20] | ANSCHLUSSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN WASSERHAHN MIT MISCHBATTERIE ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS HOCHDRUCK- ODER NIEDERDRUCKARMATUR | ||
Former [2021/20] | CONNECTION SYSTEM FOR A TAP WITH MIXING BATTERY FOR USE AS A HIGH-PRESSURE OR LOW-PRESSURE FITTING | ||
Former [2021/20] | SYSTÈME DE RACCORDEMENT POUR UN ROBINET POURVU DE MÉLANGEUR DESTINÉ À L'UTILISATION COMME ROBINETTERIE HAUTE PRESSION OU BASSE PRESSION | Examination procedure | 31.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 31.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | MC | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1072443 (POST FRITZ W [DE]) [A] 1,4* figures 1,4 *; | [A]EP0060481 (RAPETTI RUBINETTERIE [IT]) [A] 1,4 * figures 2,3 *; | [XAY]DE4421387 (GROHE ARMATUREN FRIEDRICH [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 4,9,10,11 * [A] 4 [Y] 2; | [A]EP2388378 (IDEAL STANDARD INT BVBA [BE]) [A] 1,4 * figures 2,4,5,7 *; | [Y]DE202019105673U (AL MSTREHI RAFAT [DE]) [Y] 2 * figure 1 * | by applicant | US5375624 | DE19507195 | US5853023 | DE10057591 | DE102004035644 | DE102005061032 | DE112017000317T |