EP3817323 - ENCRYPTION PROCESSING SYSTEM, ENCRYPTION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Toshiya c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Shimoyama, Takeshi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Hanaoka, Goichiro c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 2-3-26 Aomi, Koto-ku Tokyo, 135-0064 / JP | 04 /
Sakai, Yusuke c/o National Institute of Advanced Industria Science and Technology 2-3-26 Aomi, Koto-ku Tokyo, 135-0064 / JP | 05 /
Shin, Seonghan c/o National Institute of Advanced Industria Science and Technology 2-3-26 Aomi, Koto-ku Tokyo, 135-0064 / JP | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 20201995.6 | 15.10.2020 | [2021/18] | Priority number, date | JP20190199804 | 01.11.2019 Original published format: JP 2019199804 | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3817323 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3817323 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, G06F21/62 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
H04L63/0442 (EP);
G06F21/602 (EP,CN);
H04L9/085 (EP,CN,US);
H04L9/0643 (CN);
H04L9/0825 (US);
H04L9/0833 (EP);
H04L9/0841 (EP);
H04L9/0863 (CN);
H04L9/0866 (US);
H04L9/0869 (US);
H04L9/0894 (CN);
H04L9/14 (EP);
H04L9/3066 (EP);
H04L9/3247 (US);
H04L2209/46 (EP);
H04L2209/76 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | H04L29/06, G06F21/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] |
Former [2021/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM, VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2021/18] | English: | ENCRYPTION PROCESSING SYSTEM, ENCRYPTION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2021/18] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE CRYPTAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE CRYPTAGE ET PROGRAMME | [2021/18] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 01.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 18.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2023 | CZ | 14.06.2023 | DK | 14.06.2023 | EE | 14.06.2023 | ES | 14.06.2023 | FI | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | IT | 14.06.2023 | LT | 14.06.2023 | LV | 14.06.2023 | MC | 14.06.2023 | NL | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SE | 14.06.2023 | SI | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | LU | 15.10.2023 | PT | 16.10.2023 | [2024/30] |
Former [2024/28] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
IT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
IT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 14.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6026163 (MICALI SILVIO [US]) [A] 1-12 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 33 - line 45 * * column 2, line 8 - line 40 *; | [A] - ORDONEZ ARIS J ET AL, "Modified El Gamal algorithm for multiple senders and single receiver encryption", 2018 IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER APPLICATIONS & INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS (ISCAIE), IEEE, (20180428), doi:10.1109/ISCAIE.2018.8405470, pages 201 - 205, XP033372002 [A] 1-12 * page 202, column 1, paragraph 4 - paragraph end column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAIE.2018.8405470 | [A] - WANG BOYANG ET AL, "A tale of two clouds: Computing on data encrypted under multiple keys", 2014 IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORK SECURITY, IEEE, (20141029), doi:10.1109/CNS.2014.6997502, pages 337 - 345, XP032714698 [A] 1-12 * page 337, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 338, column 22; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CNS.2014.6997502 | by applicant | JP2004048336 | JP2016151797 |